Wagner v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Nicole Louise Wagner
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2010cv02413
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT re 17 Stipulation filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REMAND UNDER SENTENCE 4 OF 42 U.S.C. §405(g) re 13 Stipulation filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION re 11 Stipulation filed by Michael J. Astrue. FINAL EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Louise Wagner
Represented By: David J. Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?