L.A. Specialty Produce Co., Inc. v. Sellers Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: L.A. Specialty Produce Co., Inc.
Defendant: Sellers Markets, Inc., James Sellers and Deborah Sellers
Case Number: 4:2010cv02506
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS 30 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/23/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/2/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/24/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.A. Specialty Produce Co., Inc. v. Sellers Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A. Specialty Produce Co., Inc.
Represented By: Bart M Botto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellers Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?