Tuan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Joey Tuan
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and PWC Health and Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 4:2010cv02530
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/29/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/30/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Tuan
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PWC Health and Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?