Watters v. City of Cotati et al
Plaintiff: Martin Watters
Defendant: City of Cotati, Cotati Police Department, David Houts, Andrew Lyssand and Eric Bilcich
Case Number: 4:2010cv02574
Filed: June 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/16/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Etan Emanuel Rosen terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/14/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watters v. City of Cotati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Watters
Represented By: Ralph Cole Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cotati
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotati Police Department
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Houts
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lyssand
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bilcich
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?