Dancy v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Earl A. Dancy
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv02602
Filed: June 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 35 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 8 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 18 Ex Parte Application ; denying 19 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Earl A. Dancy. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dancy v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl A. Dancy
Represented By: Benjamin Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Howard Dorsey Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?