Kramer v. Autobytel Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Kramer
Defendant: Autobytel Inc, B2Mobile LLC and LeadClick Media, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv02722
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting re 143 Notice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 133 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY AND DEPOSE THIRD PARTIES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER APPROVING 129 WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION OF SNIDER-CANNATA INTERESTS, LLC TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/11/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting 130 STIPULATION re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Incentive Award (Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply). Responses due by 1/12/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 121 Motion for Preliminary Approval. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 122 Stipulation to Advance Hearing Date re 121 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 115 Stipulation Further Extending Deadlines Re Settlement Agreements And Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 113 Stipulation Extending Deadlines Re Settlement Agreements And Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER 111 Stipulation To Vacate Dates On Case Management Order. Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 58 66 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 99 Joint Stipulation Dismissing Claims as to Autobytel Inc. Autobytel Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re 82 Granting Stipulation TO MODIFY THE UNITED STATES TIME TO INTERVENE AND RESET HEARINGS ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 79 Granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 64 Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A Section 2403(a) and Fed R. Civ. P. 5.1. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/20/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 61 Granting Stipulation filed by Christopher Kramer, B2Mobile LLC. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. Autobytel Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kramer
Represented By: Ryan D. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autobytel Inc
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B2Mobile LLC
Represented By: Arman Javid, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeadClick Media, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?