T-Mobile West Corporation v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: T-Mobile West Corporation
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2010cv03011
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation STAYING ACTION TO ALLOW TIME FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 29 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS 31 CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile West Corporation v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile West Corporation
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?