IN RE VICKI TRAN
Appellant: Vicki Tran
Appellee: Martha G. Bronitsky and Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak,
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-Oakland and Edward D. Jellen
Case Number: 4:2010cv03035
Filed: July 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AFFIRMING DECISION AND ORDER OF BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR EVIDENCE OF REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR BRIEFING ON STATUS OF APPEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING APPELLEES 5 MOTION TO DISMISS AND ESTABLISHING NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE VICKI TRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Vicki Tran
Represented By: Drew Henwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Martha G. Bronitsky
Represented By: Martha G. Bronitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak,
Represented By: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Edward D. Jellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?