People of the State of California, ex rel. et al v. Federal Housing Finance Agency et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of California, ex rel. and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency, Edward DeMarco, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Charles E. Haldeman, Jr., Federal National Mortgage Association and Michael J. Williams
Miscellaneous: Sierra Club
Case Number: 4:2010cv03084
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 208 Motion for Extension of Time to File Final Rule and STATUS REPORT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/16/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Granting 156 Revised Stipulation Setting Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions. Motions due by 1/30/2012. Cross Motions due by 2/27/2012. Responses due by 3/12/2012. Replies due by 3/26/2012.. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RE 11/10/2011 DISCOVERY LETTER 148 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/13/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/4/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' JOINT REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE and REFERRING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ISSUES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on November 2, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting (133 in 4:10-cv-03084-CW), (82 in 4:10-cv-03317-CW), (72 in 4:10-cv-04482-CW), (145 in 4:10-cv-03270-CW) Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Answer and Discovery. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting (138 in 4:10-cv-03270-CW), (130 in 4:10-cv-03084-CW), (79 in 4:10-cv-03317-CW), (69 in 4:10-cv-04482-CW) Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Answer. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/7/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting (116 in 4:10-cv-03084-CW), (66 in 4:10-cv-03317-CW), (56 in 4:10-cv-04482-CW), (124 in 4:10-cv-03270-CW) Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/24/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING DATE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/6/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting (119 in 4:10-cv-03270-CW), (111 in 4:10-cv-03084-CW), (51 in 4:10-cv-04482-CW), (61 in 4:10-cv-03317-CW) Stipulation to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/25/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. Signed by Judge Wilken on 3/7/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF INTEREST BY THE UNITED STATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF POSITION LETTER FROM UNITED STATES. Signed by Judge Wilken on 2/3/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting (81 in 4:10-cv-03084-CW), 91 in 4:10-cv-03270-CW) Stipulation RE DISMISSAL OF OFFICERS OF FEDERAL HOUSING LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Charles E. Haldeman, Jr and Charles E. Haldeman, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER REGARDING SONOMA COUNTYS 33 MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN THE SONOMA COUNTY ACTION, 10-cv-03270. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ON SCHEDULE AND BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Wilken on 11/1/10. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California, ex rel. et al v. Federal Housing Finance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California, ex rel.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Scott Michael Border
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward DeMarco
Represented By: Scott Michael Border
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Haldeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Sierra Club
Represented By: Travis Michael Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?