Eisenberg v. The Permanente Medical Group et al
Plaintiff: Elliot Eisenberg
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and The Permanente Medical Group
Case Number: 4:2010cv03208
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2012 Filing 91 Costs Taxed for Defendants Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan in amount of $ 7,079.28 against Plaintiff, Elliott Eisenberg, M.D. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING #89 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/29/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Withdraw Hearing for Attorney's Fees and Litigation Expenses and Bill of Costs filed by The Permanente Medical Group. (Lazerson, Wendy) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER Setting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses #80 . Hearing set for 3/14/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/7/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/6/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 85 BILL OF COSTS with Exhibits A and B attached by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Knight, Cody) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 84 Proposed Order Granting #80 The Permanente Medical Group's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses by The Permanente Medical Group. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 2/3/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2012 Filing 83 Declaration of Wendy Lazerson In Support of #82 Defendant's Bill of Costs filed by The Permanente Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 2/3/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2012 Filing 82 BILL OF COSTS by The Permanente Medical Group. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 81 Declaration of Wendy Lazerson In Support of #80 the Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses filed by The Permanente Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 2/3/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by The Permanente Medical Group. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 2/17/2012. Replies due by 2/24/2012. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 79 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/20/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting #40 #42 Motions for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #75 Motion to Continue (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 18, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2012. Trial Setting Conference set for 3/15/2012 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 76 Proposed Order re Final Judgment Dismissing with Prejudice All Claims Against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Knight, Cody) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 75 MOTION to Continue Trial due to illness of counsel filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Rogers, William) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 74 TRIAL BRIEF by The Permanente Medical Group. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 73 Letter Brief re Supplemental Questionnaire for Venire Members filed byThe Permanente Medical Group. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 72 Proposed Form of Verdict by The Permanente Medical Group . (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 71 Proposed Jury Instructions by The Permanente Medical Group . (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 70 Proposed Voir Dire by The Permanente Medical Group . (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 69 Exhibit List by The Permanente Medical Group.. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 68 Witness List by The Permanente Medical Group . (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION in Limine filed by The Permanente Medical Group. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/19/2012. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 66 Filed in Error. See document #74 for correct attachmentTRIAL BRIEF by The Permanente Medical Group. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012) Modified on 1/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 Filing 65 Pretrial Conference Statement by The Permanente Medical Group. (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Erika Jean Gasaway (Gasaway, Erika) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadline. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 62 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadline by The Permanente Medical Group, Elliot Eisenberg. (Lazerson, Wendy) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Filing 61 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 12/14/2011) re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed by The Permanente Medical Group. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF DATES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND EXPERT DISCOVERY re #59 Stipulation filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 59 STIPULATION Jt. Stip and [Proposed] Order Re Extension of Dates for Expert Disclosures and Expert Discovery by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Knight, Cody) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 58 REPLY (re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) filed byThe Permanente Medical Group. (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 57 REPLY (re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CODY D. KNIGHT DEC ISO REPLY MEMORANDUM)(Knight, Cody) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 56 Proposed Order re #55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to File Redacted Versions of Documents Previously Filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to File Redacted Versions of Documents Previously Filed filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christine DAngelo DeBretteville (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 53 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. COUNSEL TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL.Declaration of Daniel M. Schwartz, MD in Opposition to (re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/12/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 52 Declaration of William J. Rogers, Esq. in Opposition (re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 51 Declaration of Elliot Eisenberg in Opposition (re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit locked. Counsel to file Administrative Motion to Seal document.)(Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/12/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) filed byElliot Eisenberg. (Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 49 RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byElliot Eisenberg. (Rogers, William) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 48 Letter from Christine de Bretteville re withdrawal of document #41 . (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/5/2011. Replies due by 10/12/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 46 FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #44 Proposed Order re #45 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Elliot Eisenberg. (Rogers, William) (Filed on 9/16/2011) Modified on 9/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2011 Filing 45 FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #43 RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) (refiled with link to initial motions) filed byElliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogers, William) (Filed on 9/16/2011) Modified on 9/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2011 Filing 44 Proposed Order re #43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to summary motions by Elliot Eisenberg. (Rogers, William) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to summary motions filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogers, William) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed by The Permanente Medical Group. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/21/2011. Replies due by 9/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration and Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Declaration and Exhibits, #3 Affidavit Declaration and Exhibits, #4 Affidavit Declaration and Exhibits, #5 Affidavit Declaration and Exhibits, #6 Proposed Order)(DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed by The Permanente Medical Group. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/21/2011. Replies due by 9/28/2011. (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/21/2011. Replies due by 9/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cody D. Knight Decl. ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Victoria Zatkin Decl. ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Regarding Motion for Summary Judgment)(Knight, Cody) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ALLOWING SEPARATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFS BY THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, ON THE ONE HAND, AND KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN AND KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, ON THE OTHER HAND by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #37 Motion for Leave to File (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Separate Summary Judgment Briefs filed by The Permanente Medical Group. (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 8/23/2011) Modified on 8/24/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2011 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Separate Summary Judgment Briefs filed by The Permanente Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #34 Stipulation filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 3/16/2011 by Mediator, Baldwin Lee; Mediation session held 3/14/2011; Case did not settle; No further facilitated discussions expected; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 34 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING USE AND DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levine, Kari) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 24, 2011 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 2/8/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Please use dial-in # 1-800-528-2987 and Participant ID 2737446#. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 7, 2011 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 1/20/2011 at 9:30 a.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 17, 2010 Filing 33 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Baldwin Lee as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting substitution of counsel: Attorney William J. Rogers substituting in for plaintiff Elliot Eisenberg formerly pro se re #31 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Elliot Eisenberg. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/30/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/29/2010 at 3:00 p.m. Pacific is off calendar and will not be rescheduled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William John Rogers substituting in for plaintiff formerly pro se (Rogers, William) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re #28 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/22/10. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 29 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/29/2010 at 3:00 p.m. Please use Call-in Number: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 3491969; Security Code: 2059. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 28 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/18/2010), Case referred to mediation. Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/12/2011. Disclosure of Experts due by 11/16/2011. Expert Discovery due by 1/5/2012. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 10/12/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2012 08:30 AM.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Elliot Eisenberg. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group re #25 Joint Case Management Statement (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 25 COMBINED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group. (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 11/12/2010) Modified on 11/15/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #16 Motion to Continue (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 20 EXHIBITS re #17 Declaration in Support, Exhibit A to Declaration of Kari Erickson Levine in Support of Request to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 19 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #20 . *** EXHIBITS re #17 Declaration in Support, of Request fo Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/22/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group re #17 Declaration in Support, #16 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed ] Order (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 17 Declaration of Kari Erickson Levine in Support of #16 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed ] Order filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed ] Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group. (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elliot Eisenberg re #2 Summons Issued, #3 ADR Scheduling Order, #1 Complaint, #4 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge as to the Permanente Medical Gruop Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elliot Eisenberg re #2 Summons Issued, #3 ADR Scheduling Order, #1 Complaint, #4 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge as to Kaiser Foundation Hospital (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elliot Eisenberg re #2 Summons Issued, #3 ADR Scheduling Order, #1 Complaint, #4 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge on Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/13/10. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/6/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Permanente Medical Group re #7 Answer to Complaint, #9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 9 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by The Permanente Medical Group. (DeBretteville, Christine) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 8 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by The Permanente Medical Group. (Lazerson, Wendy) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 7 Defendant TPMG's ANSWER to Complaint with Defendant demands a trial by jury. byThe Permanente Medical Group. (Lazerson, Wendy) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #5 Answer to Complaint (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Pro se Plaintiff Elliot Eisenberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 10/26/2010 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 11/2/2010 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals & The Permanente Medical Group. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Relief for Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act, Title VII, and Age Discrimination in Employment Act & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals & The Permanente Medical Group, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611048429] Filed by Plaintiff Elliot Eisenberg. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisenberg v. The Permanente Medical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Eisenberg
Represented By: William John Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan
Represented By: Cody Dane Knight
Represented By: Kari Erickson Levine
Represented By: Cassandra H. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Cody Dane Knight
Represented By: Kari Erickson Levine
Represented By: Cassandra H. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group
Represented By: Christine DAngelo DeBretteville
Represented By: Wendy M. Lazerson
Represented By: Erika Jean Gasaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?