Prichard v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Prichard
Defendant: Metroplitan Life Insurance Company and The IBM Long-Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 4:2010cv03313
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/07/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO ADR AND SCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Matthew Prichard, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The IBM Long-Term Disability Plan. The Telephonic Case Mana gement Conference set for 10/10/2015 is continued to 1/14/2016 at 02:30 PM. Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/9/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) Modified on 9/9/2015 (jebS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2015 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/28/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Case Referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/2/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 7 Stipulation filed by Metroplitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prichard v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Prichard
Represented By: Scott D. Kalkin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metroplitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Represented By: Michelle Yumi Magsaysay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The IBM Long-Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?