Viewpoint at the Ridge Owners Association v. Herbert
Plaintiff: Viewpoint at the Ridge Owners Association
Defendant: Walter B. Herbert
Case Number: 4:2010cv03414
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 54 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document no later than December 15, 2011. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE re 71 Stipulation filed by Viewpoint at the Ridge Owners Association. THE NOVEMBER 17, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 67 Proposed Order filed by Dolores O Kessler. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESCHEDULING HEARING re 62 Stipulation filed by Walter B. Herbert, Walter B. Herbert, Jr. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT DOLORES KESSLER'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT re 41 Stipulation filed by Dolores O Kessler. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO DEFENDANT WALTER B. HERBERT TO FILE THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT re 21 Stipulation filed by Walter B. Herbert, Walter B. Herbert, Jr. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viewpoint at the Ridge Owners Association v. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viewpoint at the Ridge Owners Association
Represented By: Robert Edward Aune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter B. Herbert
Represented By: James A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?