Stein v. ADM Careers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Stein
Defendant: ADM Careers, Inc., Michael Dubnoff and Larry Peterson
Case Number: 4:2010cv03518
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/2/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/22/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM BY 11/22/10. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/15/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 11 SELECTING ADR PROCESS, Case referred to early neutral evaluation.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/9/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. ADM Careers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stein
Represented By: Megan Ross Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Careers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dubnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?