Usher v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Less Usher
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv03536
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION to Certify Class., CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Replies due by 9/13/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2011 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 11 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Usher v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Less Usher
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?