Barnes v. The Equinox Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sean Barnes
Defendant: The Equinox Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03586
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 159 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 160 Motion for Settlement (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/30/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 154 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; AND (1) CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL; (2) PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT; (3) APPROVING NOTICE TO CLASS; AND (4) SETTING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS AND SERVICE AWARD. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/27/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE 7/16/2012 DISCOVERY LETTERS re 123 Letter filed by The Equinox Group, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/25/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re Joint Letter Brief 103 filed on 6/4/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 80 Letter filed by The Equinox Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/29/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE re 63 Letter, filed by The Equinox Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/12/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE 10/21/2011 DISCOVERY LETTERS 52 , 53 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/22/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE DISCOVERY LETTERS. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/18/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DISCOVERY LETTERS 52 , 53 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/14/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/6/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/14/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING CMC UNTIL APRIL 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/28/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/9/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY (ECF No. 15) by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler; granting 15 Motion to Stay. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CMC; DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE AS MOOT. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/3/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/18/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FILING AND SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 7 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/4/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. The Equinox Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Barnes
Represented By: Matthew Roland Bainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Equinox Group, Inc.
Represented By: JoAnna L. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?