Centrify Corporation v. Quest Software, Inc.
Plaintiff: Centrify Corporation
Defendant: Quest Software, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03873
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting ( 129 in case 4:10-cv-03873-CW; ( 33 in case 4:11-cv-04675-CW Stipulation TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 122 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 108 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROMCASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DISCOVERY ORDER re 103 Letter filed by Quest Software, Inc., Centrify Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DISCOVERY ORDER re 98 Letter filed by Centrify Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/24/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes re 85 MOTION to Compel, 84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation Setting Deadline for Centrify to Amend Its Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 61 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 Stipulation Regarding Patent L.R. 4-3 and 4-4 Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 Stipulation Regarding Patent L.R. 4-2 Deadline. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 41 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS 29 MOTION TO STAY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulated Motion to File First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING re 24 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/29/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting re 20 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion and Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centrify Corporation v. Quest Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centrify Corporation
Represented By: Edward V. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Software, Inc.
Represented By: Orion Armon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?