Vice v. Woodline USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: James P. Vice
Defendant: Woodline USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04103
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Case Dispostive Motion Hearing Date and Further Case Management Conference and Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME OF DEADLINE DATES ISSUED IN CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER OF FEBRUARY 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 7 MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE, TO TRANSFER, AND [ 27] TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF DAVID HUGHES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation Request for Order Postponing Case Management Conference Date. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY OCTOBER 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/7/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vice v. Woodline USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Vice
Represented By: Kevin Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodline USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?