U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund et al -v- South City Refrigeration
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund, U.A. Local No. 467 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund For San Mateo County and Mike Swanson
Defendant: South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04113
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam 33 . Judgment Debtor Exam set for 7/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/29/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING Judgment Debtor Exam for 3/26/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco re 30 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/4/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Post Judgment/Collections re 28 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund et al -v- South City Refrigeration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund For San Mateo County
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Swanson
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?