Engle et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Plaintiff: Carol Engle and Dave Johnson
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04141
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by Dave Johnson, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Carol Engle. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re (41 in 4:10-cv-04672-SBA) Stipulation filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Alan Saldana, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/3/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 2 ADR Scheduling Order,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RELATING CASE (C10-04672 EDL related to C10-04141 JL). Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010) Modified on 10/26/2010 (fj, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engle et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Havener
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lockhart
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Engle
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lockhart
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Johnson
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lockhart
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?