Sanchez v. Mortgageit, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mayda Sanchez
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank NA, Cal-Western Reconveyance Coporation and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv04146
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/22/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 29 30 8 Motions to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 34 Stipulation filed by Mortgageit, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Mortgageit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayda Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Blake Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?