Dixon v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Denice Dixon
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 4:2010cv04220
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Stipulation filed by United States Postal Service. Plaintiff's opposition is due 5/16/11. Defendant's reply is due 5/26/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/10/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference previously set on 4/20/2011 01:30 PM VACATED. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 11:00 AM re 26 Stipulation filed by United States Postal Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/15/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Stipulation filed by United States Postal Service. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denice Dixon
Represented By: William Randall Morton
Represented By: Larry Edward Lulofs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Melissa K. B. Sladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?