NeilMed Products, Inc. v. Techworld Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: NeilMed Products, Inc.
Defendant: Techworld Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04330
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 14, 2011 HEARING DATE re 68 Notice (Other) filed by NeilMed Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 66 Stipulation, filed by NeilMed Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING BRIEFING DATES FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 59 Stipulation filed by Techworld Corporation, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DISCOVERY ORDER. The CEO's of each party and their lead trial counsel are ordered to appear, in person, for a discovery conference on 8/26/11 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/1/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR IN PERSON MEET AND CONFER. Discovery Hearing set for 5/27/2011 AT 09:15 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/20/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Lead trial counsel for both partie shall meet and confer in person in Courtroom A no later than 5/27/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/17/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 27 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 25 Stipulation filed by Techworld Corporation, Inc., NeilMed Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE PARTIES CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 22 Stipulation filed by Techworld Corporation, Inc., NeilMed Products, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO CONTINUE JANUARY 6, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 3, 2011 re 14 Stipulation filed by NeilMed Products, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/8/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/26/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NeilMed Products, Inc. v. Techworld Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NeilMed Products, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Jasper Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techworld Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?