Oracle Amercia, Inc v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Oracle Amercia, Inc
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc. and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04340
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER RE ORACLES SEARCH FOR DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO RFP NOS. 37 AND 38 re 98 Letter Brief, filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero` on 3/21/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Oracle's reply shall be due on 3/9/12. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/12/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DISCOVERY ORDER re 87 Joint Letter Brief Seeking Order to Compel Production of Documents, filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/16/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR STIPULATION OF AUTHENTICITY AND ADMISSIBILITY OF DOCUMENTS re 82 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/18/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PRIVILEGE LOG. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/31/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 53 Motion to Strike (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 55 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 49 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 21 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 24, 2011 re 37 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 Stipulation filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/28/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CLARIFY COMPLAINT AND WITHDRAW PORTIONS OF MOTION TO DISMISS re 26 Stipulation filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE re 13 Stipulation filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/18/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/26/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle Amercia, Inc v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle Amercia, Inc
Represented By: Kent A. Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Cecchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Cecchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?