Astiana v. Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc.
Plaintiff: Skye Astiana
Defendant: Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04387
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MANDATE of USCA: That the motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. The petition is dismissed. USCA No. 14-80010. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte denying 174 Motion to Compel (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re 185 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/13/2014. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 174 MOTION to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents. Replies due by 1/21/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2014 09:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Sur-reply due by 1/30/2014. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/10/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 115 Motion to Certify Class (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE granting 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 147 Motion to Compel; granting 157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SECOND ORDER RE CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/15/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re 116 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Skye Astiana. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/13/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 AMENDED ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/31/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/31/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/29/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY re 69 Stipulation filed by Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE AND ALLOWING PARTIES TO ENGAGE IN PRIVATE ADR re 64 Stipulation filed by Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc., Skye Astiana AND VACATING 28 Order Referring Case Referred to Mediation. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 24 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Class Averments (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/24/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 35 Stipulation filed by Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 26 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc., Skye Astiana, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/15/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Astiana v. Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skye Astiana
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc.
Represented By: Janelle Jad Sahouria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?