Chaffee v. San Francisco Library Commission et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: James Chaffee
Defendant: San Francisco Library Commission and City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2010cv04521
Filed: October 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 25, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2011 Filing 25 Certificate in Response to Order to Show Cause 23 Order to Show Cause, filed byJames Chaffee. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, filed by James Chaffee (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AND SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 20 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Plaintiff shall file Certificate of Counsel within (7) seven-days of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2011 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel in Response re 19 Order to Show Cause filed by James Chaffee (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL: Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Library Commission (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION to Disqualify Judge, filed by James Chaffee. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/3/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 18 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference NOT held on 2/3/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 2/3/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 2/1/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 4/5/11 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 access code 908827. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 9 Motion for Leave to File Electronically (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by James Chaffee (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by James Chaffee, City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Library Commission. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 14 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 2/1/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 908827 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by James Chaffee (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by James Chaffee (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 11 Letter of Objection to 10 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order, from James Chaffee, dated 01/24/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 10 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically with Proposed Order, filed by James Chaffee. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 02:30 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011) Modified on 1/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Chaffee. San Francisco Library Commission served on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 7, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 5 Order Reassigning Case, (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/6/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 4 ANSWER to 1 Complaint FOR DAMAGES by City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Library Commission. (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 10/27/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to San Francisco Library Commission. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Library Commission ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611051393). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byJames Chaffee. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaffee v. San Francisco Library Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chaffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Library Commission
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?