United States ex rel. Richard T. Ogawa v. Hot Spot Fishing & Lures, Ltd.
Plaintiff: United States ex rel. Richard T. Ogawa
Defendant: Hot Spot Fishing & Lures, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04579
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Set Aside Order Enlarging Time. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation to Enlarge Time. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 15 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR STAY. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 6 First Ex Parte Application to Enlarge Time. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States ex rel. Richard T. Ogawa v. Hot Spot Fishing & Lures, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States ex rel. Richard T. Ogawa
Represented By: Kenneth Cleon Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Spot Fishing & Lures, Ltd.
Represented By: Madison C. Jellins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?