Gonzalez v. Transworld Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Josefina Gonzalez
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04584
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/28/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Scheduling 14 16 Telephonic Case Management Conference (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 11 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Transworld Systems, Inc., Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Transworld Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Gonzalez
Represented By: Lara Ruth Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Debbie Paulerio Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?