United States of America v. Pacific Mezzanine Fund LP
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pacific Mezzanine Fund LP
Case Number: 4:2010cv04664
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 631
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 39 Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Final Report and Discharging the Receiver. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 36 Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Procedures for Winding Up and Terminating the Receivership Estate. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 30 Motion For an Order Approving and Confirming the First Receiver's Report (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 29 Motion Entry of an Order Approving the Receiver's Recommended Disposition of Claims. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 15 Motion for Order Lifting the Judicial Stay for a Limited Purpose (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting re 8 Stipulation for Consent Order; Consent Order. CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Pacific Mezzanine Fund LP. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pacific Mezzanine Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Edwin L. Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Mezzanine Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?