Thurston et al v. Conopco, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chanee Thurston and Tanasha Denmon-Clark
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04937
Filed: November 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 99 Motion to Consolidate Cases (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY re 63 Stipulation filed by Conopco, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE AND ALLOWING PARTIES TO ENGAGE IN PRIVATE ADR re 58 Stipulation, filed by Tanasha Denmon-Clark, Conopco, Inc., Chanee Thurston; VACATING 30 Stipulation and Order, Case Referred to Mediation; Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 23 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Class Averments (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/24/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS; Case referred to court sponsored mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: 9 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurston et al v. Conopco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanee Thurston
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.
Represented By: Ellen Mary M. Doyle
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: Janet Lindner Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanasha Denmon-Clark
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: Ellen Mary M. Doyle
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.
Represented By: Janet Lindner Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?