eBay Inc. et al v. PartsRiver, Inc.
Plaintiff: eBay Inc. and Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: PartsRiver, Inc. and Kelora Systems, LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv04947
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting ( 200 in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW; 550 in case 4:11-cv-01548-CW; 169 in case 4:11-cv-01398-CW) Ex Parte MOTION to Vacate Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting ( 194 in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW; 545 in case 4:11-cv-01548-CW; 164 in case 4:11-cv-01398-CW) Motion to Appoint Receiver. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Post Judgment/Collectionsre ( 196 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW, 166 in 4:11-cv-01398-CW, and 547 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW) MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/4/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ( 186 in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW and 533 in case 4:11-cv-01548-CW)MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER TAXING COSTS by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting in part and Denying in part (173) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (174) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (175) Motion in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW; Granting in part and Denying in part (515) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (516) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (517) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (518) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (519) Motion; G ranting in part and Denying in part (520) Motion; Granting in part and Denying in part (521) Motion in case 4:11-cv-01548-CW; Granting in part and Denying in part (155) Motion in case 4:11-cv-01398-CW. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified on 4/5/2013 (ls, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS FOR REVIEW OF THE CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS TO THE DISCOVERY MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND GRANTING (94 in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW); (361 in case 4:11-cv-01548-CW); (57 in case 4:11-cv-01398-CW) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER RE 2/10/2012 DISCOVERY LETTER 137 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/2/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying (129) Motion to Strike ; denying (130) Motion to Shorten Time in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW; denying (451) Motion to Strike ; denying (452) Motion to Shorten Time in case 4:11-cv-01548-CW; denying (107) Motion to Strike ; denying (108) Motion to Shorten Time in case 4:11-cv-01398-CW. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS (94 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW),, (57 in 4:11-cv-01398-CW), (361 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW), (70 in 4:11-cv-02284-CW) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND SETTING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Supplemental brief due by 1/13/2012. Responses due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 1/25/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting (392 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW), (84 in 4:11-cv-01398-CW),(114 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW),(96 in 4:11-cv-02284-CW) Stipulation ON THE PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Stipulation Relating Cases. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER (103 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW), (79 in 4:11-cv-02284-CW), (67 in 4:11-cv-01398-CW), (372 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW) Stipulation Permitting Kelora Systems, LLC, to File a Single Brief Regarding Claim Construction and Summary Judgment of Not More Than 60 Pages No Later Than October 11, 2011 [Civil L.R. 6 2 & 7 12]. Responses due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting (356 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW), (60 in 4:11-cv-02284-CW), (89 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW), (52 in 4:11-cv-01398-CW) Stipulation And Joint Motion For Entry Of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re (330 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW) Stipulation/Joint Discovery Letter, filed by 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., Rockler Companies, Inc., Kelora Systems, LLC, Circuitcity.Com Inc., OfficeMax Inc., Target Corporation, Amazon.com, Inc., Dell, Inc., Newegg Inc., Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Office Depot, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/29/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REFERRING CASES to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes re (76 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW), (33 in 4:11-cv-01398-CW),(330 in 4:11-cv-01548-CW), (48 in 4:11-cv-02284-CW) Stipulation Regarding Agreed Provisions of Proposed protective Order and Party Statements Regarding Disputes for the Court's Determination. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RELATING CASES AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. This order also pertains to 72 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS (46 in 4:10-cv-05106-CW), (41 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW),(43 in 4:10-cv-05108-CW) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONSOLIDATING CASES. All future filings shall be made in Case No. C 10-4947 CW. . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (17) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:10-cv-04947-CW; granting (22) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:10-cv-05106-CW; granting (19) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:10-cv-05108-CW (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RELATING CASE with member case C-11-1398-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/11/2011. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting re (46 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW), (47 in 4:10-cv-05108-CW), (30 in 4:11-cv-00502-CW), (50 in 4:10-cv-05106-CW) Stipulation Regarding (1) Kelora's Ex Parte Application and (2) Kelora's Motion to Continue Hearing. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO RESPOND TO INTENT TO RELATE CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/4/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re (14 in 4:10-cv-05108-CW), (17 in 4:10-cv-05106-CW), (13 in 4:10-cv-04947-CW) Granting Stipulation TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL MARCH 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eBay Inc. et al v. PartsRiver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eBay Inc.
Represented By: Marc Robert Ascolese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Marc Robert Ascolese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PartsRiver, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelora Systems, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?