Cordua v. Navistar International Transportation Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Cordua
Defendant: Navistar International Transportation Corp. and Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04961
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 6 Defendant Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Case (cwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER, PENDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Previously noticed hearing date of 1/13/2011 re 6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. has been VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/16/2010. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordua v. Navistar International Transportation Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cordua
Represented By: Deborah Lynn Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Transportation Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Chandra Eskender Kiamilev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?