UNO & Company, LTD v. Kaneka Corporation
Plaintiff: UNO & Company, LTD
Defendant: Kaneka Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv05026
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 42 Stipulation Extending Additional Time to Respond to Third-Party Complaint. JBS Hair, Inc. and Jinny Beauty Supply Inc.'s Time to Respond to Third-Party Complaint EXTENDED to 06/21/11. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 42 Stipulation, filed by UNO & Company, LTD, Jinny Beauty Supply Co., Inc., JBS Hair, Inc., Kaneka Corporation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 Stipulation, filed by UNO & Company, LTD, Kaneka Corporation, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 24 Stipulation, 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process (Limited Appearance) MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process (Limited Appearance) :, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2011 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNO & Company, LTD v. Kaneka Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNO & Company, LTD
Represented By: Ryan Jared Marton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaneka Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?