Tinsley v. Pacific Gas & Electric
Plaintiff: Louis D. Tinsley
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric
Case Number: 4:2010cv05036
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Louis D. Tinsley. Order taking matter under submission on the papers. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/17/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION TO June 3, 2011 re 22 Stipulation filed by Louis D. Tinsley. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/26/2011. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 14 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Pacific Gas & Electric, Louis D. Tinsley, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/31/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinsley v. Pacific Gas & Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis D. Tinsley
Represented By: Valorie R. Cogswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric
Represented By: Erin M. Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?