Affonso v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Gary E. Affonso
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv05054
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/26/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
November 7, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 107 Stipulation filed by Gary E. Affonso. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 13, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 96 Motion for Reconsideration (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 27, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 102 Stipulation, filed by Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated Basic and Supplemental Life Insurance Plan: 501, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/27/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 8, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 83 MOTION for Clarification of Order re 78 Order, or in the Alternative, for Limited Discovery filed by Gary E. Affonso, 86 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re Standard of Review filed by Gary E. Affonso. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/8/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 1, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 81 Stipulation, filed by Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated Basic and Supplemental Life Insurance Plan: 501, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 6, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 38 Motion for Abuse of Discretion Review ; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Augment Administrative Record (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 22, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTIONS HEARING re 75 Stipulation, filed by Gary E. Affonso. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
April 12, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 30 Stipulation filed by Gary E. Affonso. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 5, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 27 Stipulation filed by Gary E. Affonso. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
February 1, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY MOLLY BARTON AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF GARY AFFONSO re 14 Notice (Other) filed by Gary E. Affonso. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affonso v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Mark Vincent Boennighausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary E. Affonso
Represented By: Robert Newl Weaver
Represented By: Guy Orville Kornblum
Represented By: Molly Olivia Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?