Arroyo v. Haddad et al
Plaintiff: Bacilia Arroyo
Defendant: Nagib Haddad and Sweet Paradise Fine Foods Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05185
Filed: November 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing January 12, 2012 Further Case Management Conference to February 2, 2012 re 32 . Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/9/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Conference to occur within sity days, if possible. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/22/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion to Appear by Telephone by Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation filed by Bacilia Arroyo. CMC CONTINUED TO JUNE 23, 2011. JOINT CMC STATEMENT DUE BY JUNE 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/25/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY FEBRUARY 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/9/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arroyo v. Haddad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bacilia Arroyo
Represented By: James Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagib Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Paradise Fine Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?