San Francisco Unified School District v. S.W. et al
Plaintiff: San Francisco Unified School District
Defendant: S.W., D.W. and P.W.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05211
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO POSTPONE ADR CONFERENCE CALL AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/23/2011 has been RESCHEDULED to 3/23/2011 01:30 PM. Parties to contact ADR Program to reschedule ADR Conference Call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/15/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/9/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE RE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY, AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Any opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay 4 due no later than 1/20/2011. Any reply due no later than 1/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/7/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Previously noticed hearing date of 1/13/2011 re 4 MOTION to Stay filed by San Francisco Unified School District has been VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/20/2010. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Unified School District v. S.W. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Unified School District
Represented By: Ruth Y Diep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?