Walling v. Aga Medical Holding
Plaintiff: Jennifer Walling
Defendant: Aga Medical Holding
Case Number: 4:2010cv05247
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by Jennifer Walling, AGA Medical Holding. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/5/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Complaint to Include AGA Medical Corporation as a Defendant re 1 Notice of Removal Complaint. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 03/04/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walling v. Aga Medical Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Walling
Represented By: Thomas Marc Litton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aga Medical Holding
Represented By: Teresa Wang Ghali
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?