Yoshimoto v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norman K. Yoshimoto
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., CSK Auto, Inc. and Ronald Stahl
Case Number: 4:2010cv05438
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying (143) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:10-cv-05438-PJH; denying (103) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:11-cv-03119-PJH (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER vacating March 19, 2014 hearing. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/12/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/9/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Hamilton deferring ruling on (108) Ex Parte Application in case 4:10-cv-05438-PJH; deferring ruling on (71) Ex Parte Application in case 4:11-cv-03119-PJH (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part (70) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:10-cv-05438-PJH; granting in part and denying in part (32) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:11-cv-03119-PJH (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re chambers copies. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 01/15/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/21/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Yoshimoto v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al., C 11-3119 MMC is referred, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), to the Honorable Laurel Beeler for consideration of whether the case is related to Yoshimoto v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al., C 10-5438 LB. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CERTIFYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT RULING 39 PER 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/7/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO JUNE 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/17/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/6/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY FEBRUARY 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/31/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoshimoto v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman K. Yoshimoto
Represented By: Robert D. Postar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSK Auto, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?