SuccessFactors, Inc. v. Halogen Software, Inc.
Plaintiff: SuccessFactors, Inc.
Defendant: Halogen Software, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05471
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FOURTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/20/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Compel. : That SuccessFactors, Inc.'s Motion to Compel due 06/06/11; Halogen Software, Inc.'s Opposition due 06/13/11; SuccessFactors, Inc.'s Reply due 06/17/11. Motion to Compel to be heard on 06/21/11 or 06/22/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 6/9/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011) Modified on 6/10/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/27/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/4/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation, filed by SuccessFactors, Inc., Halogen Software, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/10/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/10/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SuccessFactors, Inc. v. Halogen Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SuccessFactors, Inc.
Represented By: Liwen Arius Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halogen Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?