Washington v. Hill et al
Petitioner: Marcus D. Washington
Respondent: Rick Hill and Attorney General of California
Case Number: 4:2010cv05532
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 1/13/2012. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 6 Motion to Lift Stay and GRANTING 6 Motion to Reopen Case. Respondent shall file/serve an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within (60) sixty-days of issuance of this O rder; Petitioner may file a Traverse within (30) thirty-days of receipt of the Answer Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus D. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?