Lockhart et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation
Plaintiff: Arlene Baisa Lockhart and Gene Lockhart
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv05621
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, Motions terminated: 5 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Arlene Baisa Lockhart, Gene Lockhart, 39 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay the Action filed by Sprint Spectrum LP, Sprint Solutions Inc., 26 MOTION to Stay A ll Proceedings in Light of Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Application filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, 44 MOTION to Strike filed by Arlene Baisa Lockhart, Gene Lockhart.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/16/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 47 Motion VACATE DEADLINES (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re (44 in 4:10-cv-05621-SBA) MOTION to Strike filed by Arlene Baisa Lockhart, Gene Lockhart, (7 in 4:10-cv-05621-SBA) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, (5 in 4:10-cv-05621-SBA) Joint MOTION to Consol idate Cases filed by Arlene Baisa Lockhart, Gene Lockhart, (4 in 4:10-cv-05660-SBA) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, (39 in 4:10-cv-05621-SBA) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay the Action f iled by Sprint Spectrum LP, Sprint Solutions Inc., (26 in 4:10-cv-05621-SBA) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in Light of Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Application filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, (33 in 4:10-cv-05660-SBA) MOTIO N to Strike filed by Sahlimar Guerra, Al Alberto, Matt Tillman, Craig Morris, Scott Tallal, (18 in 4:10-cv-05660-SBA) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in Light of Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Application filed by Sprint Nex tel Corporation, (28 in 4:10-cv-05660-SBA) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay the Action filed by Sprint Spectrum LP, Sprint Solutions Inc., ORDER Cancelling Deadline. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss without Prejudice, Defendants Sprint Nextel Corporation, MinorCo, L.P., SWV Two, L.P. and Sprint Spectrum Holding Company, L.P.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 02/10/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 4 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockhart et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Baisa Lockhart
Represented By: Alan Roth Plutzik
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Lockhart
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Alan Roth Plutzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Kathleen Evans-Moyer
Represented By: Allen Brooks Gresham, II
Represented By: Erika Lee Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?