Sutton et al v. American Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Sutton and Lynette Sutton
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv05624
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING AMERICAN SECURITY'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGIANST HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE re 40 Stipulation, filed by American Security Insurance Company, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Sanctions Against Hartford Fire Insurance Company and its Counsel of Record. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/15/2011 02:00 PM. Hartford and its counsel of record shall file a statement addressing their non-compliance/Show Cause Response by 12/12/2011.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES re 29 Stipulation filed by American Security Insurance Company Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2011 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/27/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/2/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Plaintiffs James Sutton and Lynette Sutton substitutes James Sutton in place of Attorney Joel P. Gumbiner re 8 Notice (Other) filed by James Sutton. Attorney Joel Philip Gumbiner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/28/2011. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Request 6 to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/17/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton et al v. American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sutton
Represented By: Joel P. Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Sutton
Represented By: Joel P. Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?