Howard v. Dalisay et al
Plaintiff: Kayle Howard
Defendant: Michael Dalisay, F. Culley, David Neece, Pamploma, Susan Smith and The City of San Pablo
Case Number: 4:2010cv05655
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re: stay of case and 82 joint status update letter. The parties shall file a joint status update about the status of Ms. Howard's pending criminal case no later than August 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/24/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re: stay of case and joint status update letter. According to the parties' joint letter, Ms. Howard's criminal trial was continued from November 19, 2012 to February 13, 2013. Therefore, the case shall remain stayed and the parties shall file a joint status update about the status of Ms. Howard's pending criminal case no later than March 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/4/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RE STATUS UPDATE REGARDING PENDING CRIMINAL ACTION AGAINST PLAINTIFF due in mid December, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/28/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re: stay of case and 74 joint status update letter. The parties shall file a joint status update about the status of Ms. Howard's pending criminal case no later than September 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/21/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re: stay of case and 72 joint status update letter. The parties shall file a joint status update about the status of Ms. Howard's pending criminal case no later than June 25, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/18/2012.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re: stay of case and 68 joint status update letter. The parties shall file a joint status update about the status of Howard's pending criminal case no later than April 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/02/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re: stay of case and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 19 Defendants' motion to dismiss. The parties shall file a joint status update no later than 2/6/2012. Defendants may re-file their motion to dismiss after the court lifts the stay. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/21/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANTS NEECE, PAMPLONA, AND SUSAN SMITH. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/11/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE REGARDING LEGAL HELP DESK, HANDBOOK FOR LITIGANTS WITHOUT A LAWYER, AND LEGAL STANDARDS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/31/11. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY FEBRUARY 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/27/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY DECEMBER 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/13/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Dalisay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayle Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dalisay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamploma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of San Pablo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?