Guidetech, LLC v. Brilliant Instruments, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Guidetech, LLC
Defendant: Shalom Kattan and Brilliant Instruments, Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv05669
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 REMANDING CASE TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorneys' Fees. ORDER IS STAYED THREE DAYS TO ALLOW THE PARTIES TO DISCUSS WHETHER PLAINTIFF MAY BRING ITS CLAIMS IN THIS ACTION AS COUNTERCLAIMS IN CASE NO. C 09-5517 CW. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Order. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidetech, LLC v. Brilliant Instruments, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalom Kattan
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Behiel
Represented By: Steve Payam Hassid
Represented By: Thomas Wade Lathram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brilliant Instruments, Inc
Represented By: Steve Payam Hassid
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Behiel
Represented By: Thomas Wade Lathram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guidetech, LLC
Represented By: Daniel John Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?