District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Wallace Flooring, Inc.
Plaintiff: Doug Christopher, District Counsel 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, its Board of Trustees, Steve Havens, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, its Board of Trustees, District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades and District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
Defendant: Wallace Flooring, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05961
Filed: December 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 WRIT of execution issued in the amount of $108,738.61 as to Wallace Flooring Inc (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 MOTION to Vacate CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/20/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 17 MOTION for Default Judgment. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 13 Default. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Wallace Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Christopher
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Counsel 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, its Board of Trustees
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Havens
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, its Board of Trustees
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?