Burden v. Selectquote Insurance Services
Plaintiff: Charles Burden
Defendant: Selectquote Insurance Services
Case Number: 4:2010cv05966
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2013 Filing 118 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/6/2013. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 117 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 106 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 116 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 8/1/2013): Re 106 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action filed by Charles Burden. (Recording FTR: 9:38-9:44) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 112 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 114 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on July 25, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE by Charles Burden re 106 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/24/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/23/2013) Modified on 7/24/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2013 Filing 108 Brief: Supplemental Memorandum in Support of 106 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Charles Burden. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/19/2013) Modified on 7/22/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/22/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/22/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 Filing 107 Statement of Non-Opposition re 106 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Filing 106 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action filed by Charles Burden. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 7/9/2013. Replies due by 7/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Aproval of Class Action Settlement, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Alexander I. Dychter In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Aproval of Class Action Settlemen, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Charles Burden In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Aproval of Class Action Settlemen, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Kristin Dahl In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Aproval of Class Action Settlemen, # 5 Proposed Order)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re 103 Notice (Other) filed by Charles Burden. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/9/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tritia Miyuki Murata (Murata, Tritia) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 16, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Errata and Corrected Class Notice, filed by Charles Burden (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 4/16/2013) Modified on 4/17/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER APPROVING REVISED CLASS NOTICE re 101 Notice re Submission of Revised Class Notice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 04/05/13. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE re Submission of Revised Class Notice, filed by Charles Burden (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 3/27/2013) Modified on 3/28/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 92 Motion for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 99 Brief: Supplemental Memorandum in Support of 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 2/7/2013) Modified on 2/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING re 92 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Charles Burden. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/6/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 97 Statement of Non-Opposition to 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/7/2013) Modified on 1/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Filing 96 Joint NOTICE of Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Filing 95 Proposed Order re 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Filing 94 Declaration of Alexander I. Dychter in Support of 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Charles Burden. (Related document(s) 92 ) (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Filing 93 Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik in Support of 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Charles Burden. (Related document(s) 92 ) (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Charles Burden. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Deadline for Filing Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 12/18/2012) Modified on 12/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re 89 Motions due by 12/18/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge ARMSTRONG DENIED as moot 80 Motion to Certify Class (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 9, 2012 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties reached agreement in principle for classwide settlement. Parties anticipate that they will submit preliminary approval papers within 60 days. (FTR Recording: Not Reported) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/30/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change of Address of Counsel as to Alexander Isaac Dychter, filed by Charles Burden (Dychter, Alexander) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Filing 85 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. By no later than 8/31/2012, parties to submit a joint letter to Judge Ryu at dmrpo@cand.uscourts.gov providing an update regarding further ADR proceedings. (Recording FTR: Not Reported) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2012)
July 12, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 9/11/2012 01:00 PM. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (lrc, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Filing 84 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2012 Filing 83 Order Setting Further Settlement Conference: Further Settlement Conference set for 7/31/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/3/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 82 Reply Memorandum re 80 Renewed Motion to Certify Class, filed by Charles Burden. (Dychter, Alexander) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2012 Filing 81 Memorandum in Opposition re 80 Renewed Motion to Certify Class, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 6/25/2012) Modified on 6/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2012 Filing 80 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Charles Burden. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 6/25/2012. Replies due by 7/2/2012. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 6/11/2012) Modified on 6/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2012 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 68 Motion to Strike Class Allegation. Case referred to Magistrate Judte Donna M. Ryu for further Settlement Conference. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 07/18/12 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 06/08/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) Modified on 6/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/09/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 Filing 77 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, filed by Charles Burden (Spiro, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 75 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice re 68 Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegation, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Related document(s) 68 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 74 Reply Memorandum re 68 Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2012 Filing 73 Memorandum in Opposition re 68 Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations, filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 MOTION to Strike Remaining Class Allegations. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 MOTION to Strike Remaining Class Allegations. Responses due by 3/16/2012. Replies due by 3/23/2012. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER, Motions terminated:, ORDER Cancelling Deadline. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/2/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 67 Motion for Leave to File; denying 28 Motion to Certify Class (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 70 Memorandum in Opposition re 67 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations, filed by Charles Burden. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2012 Filing 69 Request for Judicial Notice re 68 Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 2/29/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION to Strike Remaining Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 3/13/2012. Replies due by 3/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant SelectQuote Insurance Services' Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 2/29/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Karen J. Kubin, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant SelectQuote's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 2/29/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2012 Filing 66 OBJECTIONS to 65 Notice of Intent to File Post-Summary Judgment and Motion and Request to Delay Ruling of Motion for Class Certification, filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 2/17/2012) Modified on 2/21/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Intent to File Post-Summary Judgment Motion to Strike Remaining Class Allegations, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 2/17/2012) Modified on 2/21/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference HELD. Matter did not settle. Further settlement conference to be scheduled after ruling on motion for class certification. (Recording: Not recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/24/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2012 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 01/23/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 11/7/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/27/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011) Modified on 9/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2011 Filing 60 CLERKS NOTICE: That the hearing has been CONTINUED as to 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d RELEVANT TO 34 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 9/1/2011) Modified on 9/2/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Address and Association of Counsel, filed by Charles Burden (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 8/24/2011) Modified on 8/25/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2011 Filing 57 [REDACTED VERSION] Brief: Reply Memorandum in Support re 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, filed bySelectquote Insurance Services. (Related document(s) 34 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2011 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Selectquote Insurance Services Of Redacted and Unredacted Versions of Defendant Selectquote Insurance Services' Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, for Summary Adjudication (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, for Summary Adjudication filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Karen J. Kubin in Support of Defendant SelectQuote's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant SelectQuote's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, for Summary Adjudication)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman on 8/22/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 11/7/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 54 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Settlement Conference set for 2/14/2012 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/18/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 53 RESPONSE (re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCharles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 27, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 52 Responses due by 8/5/2011. Replies due by 8/22/2011. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 51 Stipulation. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment EXTENDED 08/05/11; Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment EXTENDED to 08/22/11. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/25/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2011 Filing 51 STIPULATION re Modification of Briefing Schedule, filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/25/2011) Modified on 7/26/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/2/2011. Replies due by 8/16/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 38 Motion to Reset Hearing Date for Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Opposition due 08/02/11; Defendant's Reply due 08/16/11. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/19/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2011 Filing 49 OBJECTIONS to Reply Evidence re 47 Declaration in Support, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 Filing 48 Reply Memorandum re 28 Motion to Certify Class filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified on 7/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 Filing 47 Supplemental Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik in Support of 28 Motion for Class Certification filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified on 7/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 46 Appendix of Evidence re 45 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re 28 Motion to Certify Class, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Planitiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kubin Declaration ISO Sealing Confidential Exhibits to Karasik Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Sealing Confidential Exhibits to Karasik Declaration)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 42 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 41 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Declaration of Karen J. Kubin in Support of Defendant SelectQuote Insurance Services' Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, for Summary Adjudication by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 40 Memorandum in Opposition re 38 Motion to Re-Set Hearings on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2011) Modified on 6/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2011 Filing 39 Declaration of Karen J. Kubin in Support of 32 Notice of Lodging of Deposition Exhibits Designated filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 6/1/2011) Modified on 6/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION to Re-Set Hearings on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 28 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Re-Set Hearings)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 37 Declaration of Karen J. Kubin in Support of 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2011 Filing 36 Declaration of Nancy Malik in Support of 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2011 Filing 35 Declaration of Charan J. Singh in Support of 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2011 Filing 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Confidential Declaration of Karen J. Kubin In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication, and Exhibits A-G Thereto filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Karen J. Kubin, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Lodging of Deposition Exhibits Designated re 28 Motion to Certify Class by Defendant as Confidential, filed by Charles Burden (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 5/25/2011) Modified on 5/27/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2011 Filing 31 Declaration of Charles Burden in Support of 28 MOTION to Certify Class filed byCharles Burden. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 30 Declaration of Alexander I. Dychter in Support of 28 MOTION to Certify Class filed byCharles Burden. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 29 Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik in Support of 28 MOTION to Certify Class filed byCharles Burden. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Charles Burden. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/16/2011. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Motions due by 2/7/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Jury Selection set for 4/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/4/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 27, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 27 Responses due by 6/21/2011. Replies due by 7/5/2011. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 27, 2011 Filing 27 AMENDED Minute Entry: Case Management Conference to Include Briefing Schedule for Class Certification Motion held on 4/27/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Motion for Class Certification Hearing CONTINUED to 07/26/11 at 1:00 PM; Motion papers due by 05/31/11; Oppositions due by 06/21/11; Reply due by 07/05/11 (Date Filed: 4/27/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2011) Modified on 5/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2011 Filing 25 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/27/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Last day to amend pleading or add parties 04/27/11; General Discovery Cut-Off 12/16/11; Motion Cut-Off 02/07/12; Pretrial Conference Continued to 04/03/12 at 1:00 PM; Jury Trial Continued to 04/09/12 at 8:30 AM. Case referred to Magistrate Judge for MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to be held between 02/13/12 and 03/02/12. (Date Filed: 4/27/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2011) Modified on 5/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 ADR Remark: A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 8/22/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 21, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 4/21/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2011 04:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 4/18/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 6 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file responsive pleading to Amended Complaint within (14) fourteen-days of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 03/29/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified on 4/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Charles Burden. (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 20 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 4/21/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 19 Reply Memorandum re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Filing 18 JOINT NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by Charles Burden, Selectquote Insurance Services (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Charles Burden. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory N. Karasik in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 3/15/2011) Modified on 3/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Filing 15 Proposed Order re 6 Motion to Dismiss by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Certification of Compliance with Meet and Confer Requirement in Connection with Pending Motion to Dismiss re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Selectquote Insurance Services (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Charles Burden (Karasik, Gregory) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE re: Defendant's Failure to E-File re 1 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing to 4/5/2011 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2011 03:30 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/10/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/7/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Selectquote Insurance Services and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Selectquote Insurance Services AMENDED (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Selectquote Insurance Services of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 30, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/30/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Selectquote Insurance Services identifying Other Affiliate Charan J. Singh, Other Affiliate William T. Grant for Selectquote Insurance Services. re 1 Notice of Removal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 10-496770. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611054456). Filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/6/2011 (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2011: # 1 Notice of Removal, Part 2 of 5, # 2 Notice of Removal, Part 3 of 5, # 3 Notice of Removal, Part 4 of 5, # 4 Notice of Removal, Part 5 of 5, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burden v. Selectquote Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectquote Insurance Services
Represented By: Karen Joyce Kubin
Represented By: Tritia Miyuki Murata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Burden
Represented By: Gregory N. Karasik
Represented By: Alexander Isaac Dychter
Represented By: Dennis Frank Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?