Castro Valley Union 76, Inc. v. Vapor Systems Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Castro Valley Union 76, Inc.
Defendant: Vapor Systems Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00299
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ACTION, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/20/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 64 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/22/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 33 Motion to Certify Class (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR THE COMPLETION OF CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY; THE FILING OF A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, OPPOSITION AND REPLY; HEARING TO DETERMINE CLASS CERTIFICATION re 20 Stipulation, filed by Castro Valley Union 76, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro Valley Union 76, Inc. v. Vapor Systems Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Systems Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tarifa B Laddon
Represented By: Robert S. Ray
Represented By: Todd Matthew Sorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castro Valley Union 76, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Represented By: Thomas P. Bleau
Represented By: Martin Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?