Patino v. Recontrust Company, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Penny L. Patino |
Defendant: |
Bank of America, Bank of America Home Loans, BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, Recontrust Company, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv00345 |
Filed: |
January 24, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
Contra Costa |
Presiding Judge: |
Claudia Wilken |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 6, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 6 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Court Connected Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
56
ORDER RE: COURT CONNECTED MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing
33
ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand Hearing Dates. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand Hearing Dates. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 6 MOTION to Remand, 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Patino v. Recontrust Company, N.A. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bank of America |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Alison Marie Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Alison Marie Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Alison Marie Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Alison Marie Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Alison Marie Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Alison Marie Norris |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Michael Joseph Moloney, III |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Ellis |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Penny L. Patino |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?