Jazz Casual Productions, Inc. v. Byron et al
Plaintiff: Jazz Casual Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Euro Arts Music International GmbH, Naxos of America, Inc., Toby Byron and East Stinson, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00352
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/2/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Jazz Casual Productions, Inc. against Toby Byron, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/1/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING ON REFERRED ISSUES AND ORDER TO FILE BRIEFS. Plaintiff shall file briefs or evidence on the questions on or before June 1, 2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 5/23/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jazz Casual Productions, Inc. v. Byron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Arts Music International GmbH
Represented By: Lawrence Griffith Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naxos of America, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Griffith Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Stinson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazz Casual Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ames Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?