Porter v. Springer et al
Plaintiff: Patrick K. Porter
Defendant: Newreality Inc., Michael Grady, Newreality LLC, Dale Ann Springer, Bruce Springer, Suzy Prudden, Jim Vigue, Tom Hanson and Lynette Owens
Case Number: 4:2011cv00363
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/5/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/27/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REOPENING CASE, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2012 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/4/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Patrick K. Porter, Newreality LLC, Newreality Inc., Dale Ann Springer, Bruce Springer, 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Patrick K. Porter, Newreality LLC, Tom Hanson, Newreality Inc., Jim Vigue, Dale Ann Springer, Bruce Springer., Newreality Inc. (a Nevada Corporation), Newreality LLC (a California Limited Liability Company), Newreality LLC (a California Limited Liability Company), Newreality LLC (a California Limited Liability Company), Bruce Springer (an individual), Bruce Springer (an individual), Bruce Springer (an individual), Dale Ann Springer (an individual), Dale Ann Springer (an individual), Dale Ann Springer (an individual), Newreality Inc. (a Nevada Corporation) and Newreality Inc. (a Nevada Corporation) terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRON on 3/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 62 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Newreality LLC, Newreality Inc., Dale Ann Springer, Bruce Springer Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2012 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/15/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 Stipulation, filed by Patrick K. Porter, Newreality LLC, Tom Hanson, Newreality Inc., Jim Vigue, Dale Ann Springer, Bruce Springer. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/31/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Springer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newreality Inc.
Represented By: Paul Silvio Berra
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newreality LLC
Represented By: Paul Silvio Berra
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Ann Springer
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Paul Silvio Berra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Springer
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Paul Silvio Berra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzy Prudden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Vigue
Represented By: Kevin Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hanson
Represented By: Kevin Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick K. Porter
Represented By: David Andrew Veljovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?